Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kathleen Nerogic, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Emminger, Joseph Herbert, against Casimira Fedak, represented by Moriarity, Erin Melissa, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT FOR ANS | ||
April 15, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 24, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.