Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pb-66 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barr, Paul K., Fogel, Yitzchak Meir, against Linda Baumann As Executor Of The Estate Of Sylvia Dimet, Linda Baumann As Executor Of The Estate Of Wendy E. Dimet, Niagara Falls City School District, represented by Lema, Ryan Albert, Lowe, Amanda Louise, Morley, Mary Jane Rivington, Roscetti, James C., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Mark Grisanti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark Grisanti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 15, 2021DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
September 28, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
September 20, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
September 20, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 10, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Decision |
||
August 31, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Corrected Proposed Order |
||
August 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Decision - 08.10.21 |
||
August 30, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 10, 2021 | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.