Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John W. Crawford Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Humann, Max Brian, against Robin E. Gardner, represented by Moriarity, Erin Melissa, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 20, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 10, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 28, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #3) Counterstatement of Material Facts |
||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition/Reply Affirmation |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #3) Pinnacle Orthopedic Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pinnacle Orthopedic Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
November 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Defendant's deposition transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.