Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aline Boland, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andrews, Benjamin Joseph, Blum, Amanda Noel, against Jennifer Hodgson, represented by Curvin, Steven P., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 22, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: June 03, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 25, 2021ORDER - JOINT TRIAL
Date: October 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: October 26, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Settled |
||
June 03, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Amended Order |
||
October 26, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
October 19, 2021 | ORDER - JOINT TRIAL | ||
September 22, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 20, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Justice Sedita |
||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.