Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Foods, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Lisa Kinzia, The Garage Pizzeria, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: April 21, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 14, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 14, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 14, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
March 21, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
March 14, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 14, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
February 07, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Client Affidavit |
||
February 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
February 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Credit Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.