Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Matthew Mullett, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Schiavetta, Daniel M, against Camellia Bellis, Jane Doe, Phoenix Insurance Company, Travco Insurance Company, represented by Buckley, Michael Ernest, Usery, Brent Shelbin, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: January 11, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 16, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: June 30, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: June 20, 2022SUMMONS
Date: February 04, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 19, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order |
||
January 11, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER To file a Proposed Confidentiality and Protective Order to be so ordered by a judge |
||
January 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order |
||
June 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
May 05, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | ||
April 16, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Policies |
||
April 16, 2021 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.