Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rediform Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Ramone Tate, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a military verification |
||
September 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 17, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
November 18, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.