Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Amanda M. Newton, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a military verification |
||
August 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
August 10, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
April 09, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.