Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Julianne Hillman, Timothy M. Leising, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 16, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Amended Income Execution |
||
January 25, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a military verification |
||
December 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.