Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jakas, Joseph Karl, Loiselle, Anna L., Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason P, against Karen S Borczynski, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: September 27, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: May 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 24, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 17, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) NOTICE OF COURT DATE to DEFENDANT |
||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Additional Notice of Summary Judgment Motion |
||
November 28, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Notice of Court Date |
||
November 28, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PRO SE FILER - BORCZYNSKI |
||
November 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Additional Mailing Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment (to court) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.