Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ljupco Popovski, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Demirayak, Caner, against County Of Nassau, Quintal Contracting Corp, Town Of Oyster Bay, represented by Disilvio, Peter Frank, Ehrlich, Paul S., Goetz, Samantha Ashley, Masiakos, Jordan, Mercurio, Eric D, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Felice Muraca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFelice Muraca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Demand for Compliance with 4-26-23 Discovery Order |
||
May 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 31, 2023 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
December 04, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Addressed to the Honorable Eileen C. Daly-Sapraicone regarding Discovery Dispute and Permissi Letter Addressed to the Honorable Eileen C. Daly-Sapraicone regarding Discovery Dispute and Permissi ... show more |
||
October 10, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 26, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 11, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Revised |
||
June 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.