Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) Other Matters - Civil Forfeiture case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against Honda Lease Trust, Rashawn James, Usaa Federal Savings Bank, represented by King, Robert Harold, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with David P Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid P Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Civil Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 07, 2022 |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) Decision |
||
December 23, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - f (Motion #001) letter |
||
December 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) stipulation of partial discontinuance |
||
December 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) summons and complaint |
||
December 23, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #001) dmv registration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.