Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Speregen, Adam Brian, against Nassau County Clerk, Shon L. Ferguson, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp3 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp3 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Contract (Non-Commercial)) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 03, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Foreclosure Part 3 PCOM #2 (Conversion) Judge: Part 3, Foreclosure |
|
April 28, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
April 28, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and complaint |
||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Service affidavits |
||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit |
||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHON L. FERGUSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.