Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lee Bradley, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Davoli, Henry W, against Island Automotive And Collision, Inc., Keith Squire, Keith Squires S H A Kevin Squire, Kevin Anthoney S H A Kevin Squire, Kevin Squire, (total of 5) See All represented by Suris, Raymond Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 12, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT- CERTIFIED COPY | ||
January 31, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 31, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
October 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 28, 2022 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
May 02, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 02, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
March 22, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
January 10, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
November 01, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.