Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Theresa Acosta Raia Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of John Raia, Deceased, Theresa Acosta Raia Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of John Raia, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Grossman, Michael Bruce, Hummel, Jeffrey Daniel, against Mount Sinai South Nassau, represented by Cammarosano, Joseph R., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Diccia T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 06, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: July 06, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 27, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: May 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 23, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 29, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 16, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 27, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
||
September 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS |
||
May 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | ||
May 02, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
March 16, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 15, 2022 | Hearing |
Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Held ADR/ES CONFERENCE PART Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
September 28, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.