Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Loiselle, Anna L., against Gary Labush, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Roy S. Mahon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoy S. Mahon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 13, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
July 13, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
||
July 08, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Roy S. Mahon |
||
April 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - GARY LABUSH |
||
April 06, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
March 03, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.