Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Michael A. Grimaldi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yankowitz, Jack A, Yankowitz, Skylar Kody, against Related Services, Llc, Robert Louis Guiliano Jr., represented by Feehan, Thomas Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Leonard D Steinman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D Steinman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 03, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 03, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 20, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
March 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.