Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jose Medina, Rene Morales, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alfisi, Mark Anthony, against Isaac D. Mcphillip, Julie Lopez, Lindsey J. Zenk, represented by Kurland, Stuart Michael, Marron, Lauren Elizabeth, Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A Mcdonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Mcdonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Joint Trial |
||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Affirmation in Support |
||
November 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-F (Motion #001) Police Report, Summons & Complaints, Answers |
||
November 01, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) PURSUANT TO 202.8-b |
||
October 18, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 04, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.