Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Marion Friedrich, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sorce, Joseph Michael, against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Turnstead Property, Llc, represented by Levien, Bradley Jay, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
September 18, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement authorizing efiling |
||
September 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
August 24, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 19, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
May 31, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
May 02, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
February 24, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
November 15, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
October 04, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.