Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arturo Hansen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Salomon, Michael Lawrence, against Maria Santos, Yovanny Santos-Mora, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher G Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 3 NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 2 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 1 PLEADINGS S&C ANSWER |
||
February 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation in support |
||
February 14, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
March 25, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
March 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint and Answer |
||
March 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Bill of Particulars |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.