Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., As Indenture Trustee For The Registered Noteholders Of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Barbara Vuolo A K A Barbara A. Rapuzzi, Capital One Bank Usa Na, Columbia University Dept. Of Ob-Gyn Pc, Commissioner Of Taxation And Finance, Confidential Lending Llc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005) *Corrected*
Date: March 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 11, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #007) COPY OF ORDER |
||
January 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) Affirmation of Service |
||
January 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE REFEREE |
||
January 17, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #007) ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE REFEREE |
||
January 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #007) COPY OF OFFICE CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE REFEREE |
||
November 22, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SCHEDULE A FORECLOSURE SALE |
||
October 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) Notice of Motion for an Order Seeking an Extension of Time to Set Sale Notice of Motion for an Order Seeking an Extension of Time to Set Sale Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Summons and Complaint and Notices of Pendency |
||
October 24, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Attorney Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.