Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edward Cheri, Sarina Race, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Curley, Mark Craig, Dibenedetto, Donald S, Longeretta, David Anthony, against Dain Forney, represented by Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) SDA |
||
November 19, 2021 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) PARTIAL SDA |
||
August 04, 2021 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
July 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 10, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
April 13, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
March 31, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 30, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 18, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: DISCOVERY DEMANDS, ETC. |
||
February 18, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) ANSWER W/COUNTER-CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.