Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Joseph Wilmer, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Defendant's answer |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notification Ltr. to Defendant |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Motion |
||
March 31, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
March 31, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) PROPOSED ORDER |
||
August 12, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
August 11, 2021 | Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.