Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Resurrection Life Fellowship, filed a(n) Other Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property case represented by Rollinson, David Charles, against Xxxx, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
|
PETITION
Date: January 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
February 23, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 22, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
February 22, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 10, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 08, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
February 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.