Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Canandaigua National Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mcandrew, John Kevin, against Also Steel Corporation, Graphic Laminating, Llc, Huntington National Bank, John Doe, Ledco, Inc., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 24, 2022STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
March 11, 2022 |
STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Discontinue action, Cancel LP and Vacate Judgment |
||
March 11, 2022 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order vacating Judgment, Discontinuing action and cancelling Lis pendens |
||
February 24, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION of sale 2/28/22 |
||
January 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT of posting |
||
January 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOS - new date |
||
January 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE new date |
||
December 13, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT of posting |
||
December 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 24, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale COMMERCIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.