Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jeffrey Corcoran, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jaclyn West Corcoran, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
May 25, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
May 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
May 12, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 12, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
May 11, 2021 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
April 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
April 19, 2021 | NYS CASE REGISTRY FILING FORM | ||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
April 19, 2021 | UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL PACKET - WITH CHILDREN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.