Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Northeast Masonry Work, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Alter, Bernard Mitchell, against Amec , Llc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Freedman, Perry D, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Leon Ruchelsman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeon Ruchelsman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 14, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, etc. |
||
July 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Order with Order attached |
||
July 21, 2021 | DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING | ||
June 21, 2021 |
NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF REJECTION OF PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY |
||
June 18, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation in Opposition to Motion and In Support of Cross Motion (6-18-2021) |
||
June 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
June 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN |
||
June 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B-Santangelo Mechanics Lien (9-10-2019) (with filing receipt) |
||
June 14, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) notice of cross motion |
||
June 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A-Discharge of Mechanics Lien Bond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.