Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Terrell Edwards, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Heffez, Sam Nissim, against 405 Realty Llc., represented by Rosenbaum, Dara L, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJury Coordinating Part 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 24, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 24, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 27, 2022NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: June 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 24, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected* Note of Issue |
||
June 27, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 6/13/22 |
||
December 02, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
December 01, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
November 24, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Counselor |
||
November 23, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
November 08, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Case Scheduling Order |
||
November 08, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Counselor |
||
September 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
September 24, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.