Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
371 Decatur, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Salta, Romeo J, against Atlantis Plumbing & Heating Corp., Borowide Electrical Contractors, Inc., His Ny2, Inc., Joseph Kapassakis, Kimberly Peck, (total of 6) See All represented by Albanese, Christopher Anthony, Barous, John E., Camacho, Vincent Juan, Faglione, Paul Richard, Gangemi, Jeffrey A, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Katherine Levine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Levine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 26, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 09, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #3) SIGNED OSC |
||
March 30, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 24, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer and Counterclaims in Action 2 |
||
March 16, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
March 16, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Action 2 Complaint |
||
March 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Second Amended Complaint |
||
January 18, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law in Reply |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.