Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chrystal Peart, Wade S. Williams, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davidoff, Ruben, Simuro, Arthur, Tuthill, Shanti Jennifer, against Ean Holdings Llc, John Doe, Said Name Is Being Fictitious And Unknown, represented by Economou, Paulina, Savidge, Edward J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Karen B Rothenberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren B Rothenberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 26, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 19, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 31, 2023ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 24, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 11, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 11, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #1)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 04, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 25, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #5)
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 12, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 11, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 31, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 29, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 13, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 12, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE withdraw motion |
||
February 14, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 2/9/23 |
||
February 09, 2023 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Amended Proposed Order of 02-02-23 (in lieu of NYSCEF Doc #181) |
||
February 09, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order of 02-02-23 (Proposed) |
||
January 31, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT demands |
||
January 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 13, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 05, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge 1/5/2023 |
||
January 04, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Same is filed as to Motion Seq #5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.