Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Keith Bruce Jackson, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lacertosa, Jared James, against Roman Catholic Diocese Of Brooklyn, St. Clement Pope Church, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: April 16, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: July 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
April 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.