Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alexander Kyron, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levit, Oleg, against Kevin Winter, L. Vazquez-Winter, represented by Mctiernan, William Brian, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter P. Sweeney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 07, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 03, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 11, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 26, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth For MW |
||
May 26, 2021 |
ANSWER With Demands |
||
April 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.