Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Elissa Regev, Elissa Regev On Behalf Of Herself And All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Nyu Langone Hospitals, represented by Forzano, Matthew Joseph, Porzio, Christopher James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Garson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Garson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #2) DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE VERIFIED AMENDED COMP DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE VERIFIED AMENDED COMP ... show more |
||
January 07, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING | ||
January 05, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) of Christopher Porzio in Support of Motion to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint |
||
October 06, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) To Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint |
||
October 06, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint |
||
October 06, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Verified Amended Complaint |
||
August 26, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
August 16, 2021 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.