Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alayne Real Estate, Inc., Setam Realty Associates, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Francis, Jeremy Bradford, against Alan D. Lasher, Angela Millwater, represented by Loveless, Charles Alan, Saltiel, Jeffrey Leon, Wenig, Meryl Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWayne Saitta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2012 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Breach Of Contract) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #28)
Date: March 07, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #28)
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 30, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 27, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #29)
Date: April 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #28)
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #29)
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #28)
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 27, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #28) dated 2/21/23 |
||
February 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 14, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #29) Dated 1/23/2023 |
||
January 24, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #28) DTD 1/19/2023 |
||
January 19, 2023 | Affirmation Re Plaintiffs' Surrogate's Court Petition | ||
September 21, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Dated: 09/15/2022 |
||
September 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Surrogate's Court Petition |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Affirmation in Compliance with the Court's March 2, 2022 Order |
||
July 12, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Response to Defendants' July 11, 2022 Letter to Justice Knipel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.