Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Great Lakes Cheese Co., Inc., Great Lakes Cheese Of New York, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hines, Patrick John, Martin, Fallon E, against Cargill, Incorporated, G & L Trucking, Inc., Kuhnle Brothers, Inc., represented by Cueter, Matthew Peter, Dooley, Teresa Hansaem, Smith, Tracey Salmon, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Ucc |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 13, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 14, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 10, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 10, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 23, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 05, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 20, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 03, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 24, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 10, 2021SUMMONS
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 03, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 22, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: April 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 28, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 10, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 28, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 30, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order |
||
December 01, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 03, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Admission Pro Hac Vice |
||
October 20, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
October 20, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.