Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashley L. King, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mccann, Thomas H., against Timothy M. King, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with Main Jr., Hon. Robert G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMain Jr., Hon. Robert G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
June 23, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
June 23, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 23, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 23, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Post-Judgment Main, Jr. (Court Activity) Judge: Main Jr., Hon. Robert G. |
|
June 21, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 21, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 15, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
March 24, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.