Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Amy B. Wenske, Leigh W. Wenske, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Graziane, Elizabeth A, against Jon S. Waldrop Jr., represented by Catone, Paul Joseph, Donohue, Mark P., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 05, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: May 21, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: January 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 26, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 09, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
December 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice IME Appointment |
||
September 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - So Ordered Letter-Correspondence Extend Time IME and NOI |
||
September 06, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 26, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Discovery Request for Extension re EBT & NOI |
||
August 24, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
August 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 13, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS BP as to Affirm Defenses (served 8-17-21) |
||
July 13, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiffs Discovery Demands (served 8-17-21) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.