Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against James M Sidor, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 27, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
September 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order |
||
September 16, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Affidavit |
||
September 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Invoice for Service |
||
September 06, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
July 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
July 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.