Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elan Financial Services, U S Bank N A Dba, U.S. Bank National Association D B A Elan Financial Services, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Lucas J Nason, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 17, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
May 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - LUCAS J NASON |
||
April 22, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
March 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
March 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.