Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Joseph Peters, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 22, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.