Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Camelia Keriakos, Magdy Keriakos, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Jones, E. Stewart, against Adiorndack Health, Adirondack Medical Center, Lake Placid Sports Medicine, Pllc, Lake Placid Sports Medicine P L L C, William J Smith M D, (total of 6) See All represented by Depaolo, Aaron M., Phillips, Emily Anne, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2021DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: February 12, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 19, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence to Judge re: amended discovery schedule |
||
June 27, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 21, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge with proposed discovery schedule |
||
May 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Scheduling E-mail |
||
September 09, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE of 9.1.21 letter order w amended discovery schedule |
||
September 08, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 01, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Bruening w request for extension of Scheduling Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.