Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Randy L Beckwith, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 28, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: February 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: March 16, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 16, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
February 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 05, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
December 28, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
||
December 28, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement |
||
December 28, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.