Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Karen Welch, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 07, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 10, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
May 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
May 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.