Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Desiree D Skutt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Soloski, Tina J., against Michael G Skutt, represented by Balzer, Chad Edward, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Richard B Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
February 09, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 08, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
February 08, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
February 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 28, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 28, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 14, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 13, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 20, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Judicial Assignment Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.