Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert P Clark As Administrator Of The Estate Of, Robert P Clark As Administrator Of The Estate Of, Sharon M Clark Deceased, Sharon M Clark Deceased, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Iacono, Michael Anthony, against Autumn View Health Care Facility, Autumn View Health Care Facility, Llc, Buffalo General Medical Center, Kaleida Health, The Mcguire Group, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Bargnesi, Juliet Marie, Barone, Robert David, Britt, Jason Tyler, Sweet, Kathleen Marie, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Mark Grisanti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark Grisanti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Nursing Home) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 17, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 18, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: April 10, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answer |
||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Correspondence dated 063021 |
||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Omnibus Discovery Demands |
||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint |
||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 18, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 18, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.