Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Buffalo Energy Savers, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weimer, Francis P., against Calamar Construction Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 10, 2021 | ||
July 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 06, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.