Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Megan L Leising, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Slisz, Richard Charles, against Stephen M Leising, represented by Grocott, Steven Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
April 08, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
January 03, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
December 20, 2021 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
December 20, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
December 20, 2021 | UCS - 111 | ||
December 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION / PROCEEDING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.