Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Jason A Jaworski, represented by Demarco, Joseph Edward, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 |
202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE Attempted not known. Unable to forward. |
||
May 06, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
May 04, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 28, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Billing Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.