Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Edwin L Casey, represented by Whittemore, David S., in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
July 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
July 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
July 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
July 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 BILLING STATEMENT OF LAST PAYMENT R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
July 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1380640 | ||
July 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
July 16, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1380640 |
||
May 26, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 12, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.