Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anne Chmielewski, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Paulo-Lee, Olivia T, against James Bindics, represented by Cooper, Michael Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald J Greenan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald J Greenan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
July 12, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 17, 2022 | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION | ||
April 23, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
April 23, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 23, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand to Produce & Omnibus Discovery Demands |
||
April 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
April 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
April 08, 2021 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.